Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 415 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 415 Week
» 22921 Month
» 326111 Year
» 1547676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4697 on 14/02/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 352
To Service Fri 14/02/1945
Withdrawal Fri 02/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 14/02/1945
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/02/1956
82C Swindon m/e 16/06/1956
81C Southall 7w/e 22/06/1964
83C Westbury 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn on 02/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 81C Southall 2w/e 08/06/1964
ALLOC 83C Westbury 3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   on 02/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
19/08/1962 Wolverhampton Works (In Works) In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. SLS/196209
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Oxley MPD) 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/02/1945 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4697
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (83C)    
02/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4697    

prev prev