Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 479 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 479 Week
» 22985 Month
» 326175 Year
» 1547740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4702 m/e 02/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 47xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 221
To Service During 02/1922
Withdrawal Thu 28/06/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1922
81C Southall 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn on 28/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. SLS/194802

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1922 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4702
Built at Swindon Works
   
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
28/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4702    

prev prev