Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 726 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5300 Week
» 33258 Month
» 67900 Year
» 1289465 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4704 m/e 04/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 47xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1922
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 42 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 03/11/1962
81A Old Oak Common 2w/e 17/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SALOP Shrewsbury w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 2w/e 17/11/1962
WDN   06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1922 To Service To service as GWR Number 4704
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4704    

prev prev