Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1099 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8106 Week
» 14240 Month
» 242124 Year
» 1463689 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4706 m/e 03/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 47xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 221
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal During 02/1964
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1923
83D Laira 4w/e 01/11/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/10/1953
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. SLS/194708
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4706
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4706    

prev prev