Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 611 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6216 Week
» 17763 Month
» 417445 Year
» 494032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (1st) 4820   11/1933
GWR (2nd) 1420   30/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 14xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-4-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1933
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Service Life 31 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CVCYS   4w/e 26/01/1946
NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/04/1946
CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 18/05/1946
81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1953
81C Southall 4w/e 04/10/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 08/08/1959
86C Hereford 4w/e 24/02/1962
85B Gloucester Horton Road 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 24/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1933 To Service To service as GWR Number 4820
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/01/1946 Allocation      
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )    
18/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 1420    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 1420    

prev prev