Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1934 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19737 Week
» 72753 Month
» 192280 Year
» 3219133 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4838 |
on |
17/08/1934 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1438 |
on |
15/10/1946 (at Swindon Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
288 |
To Service |
Fri 17/08/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/11/1962 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/04/1962 |
Oswestry Works |
823, 1438, 3213, 3789, 7413, 7819, 46520. |
SLS/196205 |
11/08/1963 |
Oswestry Works (shed dump) |
3630, 48739 (89A), 73035 an 80105. On shed dump were 1432/8, 5421, 7428/34 an 7033 (no name or number plates). |
SLS/196309 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4838 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wallingford (rdg) |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
15/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1438 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
09/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1438 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|