Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 86 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3703 Week
» 15408 Month
» 346897 Year
» 423484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (1st) 4842   04/1935
GWR (2nd) 1442   31/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 14xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-4-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Service Life 29 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81F Oxford 4w/e 31/03/1951
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 26/12/1953
82D Westbury 4w/e 03/11/1962
83C Exeter 2w/e 17/11/1962
83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 02/11/1963
83B Taunton 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964
83E Yeovil Town 6w/e 12/10/1964
83D Exmouth Junction 2w/e 21/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 83C Exeter 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 5w/e 02/11/1963
TOSTORE   26/11/1963
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 4842
Built at Swindon Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 1442    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 1442    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
21/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    

prev prev