|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1962 | Leominster MPD | Leominster shed, sub to Shrewsbury, was closed from 30th April and engines and duties (Kington goods and Leominster pilot) transferred to Hereford-its former parent shed. Since January, 1961, when it came under Shrewsbury, Hereford has still supplied engines and in February, 1962, 1420/47 were allocated to Leominster permanently and remained until closure. Now both are booked to run light engine from Hereford and return thereto in the even-ing. | SLS/196206 |
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/04/1935 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4847 Built at Swindon Works |
||
16/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG) | ||
16/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1447 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) | ||
21/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
16/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Slough (81B) | ||
20/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Radyr (88B) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B) | ||
24/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (86C) | ||
17/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1447 | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |