Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (1st) 4850   07/1935
GWR (2nd) 1450   30/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 14xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-4-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1935
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Service Life 29 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81B Slough 4w/e 30/04/1951
81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1959
83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962
83B Taunton 4w/e 02/11/1963
83E Yeovil Town 6w/e 12/10/1964
83D Exmouth Junction 2w/e 21/02/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81B Slough m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 83B Taunton 5w/e 02/11/1963
TOSTORE   5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 4850
Built at Swindon Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 1450    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
21/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 1450    

prev prev