Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 432 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2878 Week
» 14583 Month
» 346072 Year
» 422659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (1st) 4866   28/02/1936
GWR (2nd) 1466   30/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 14xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-4-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 28/02/1936
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
133 Newton Abbot 4w/e 03/11/1945
83C Exeter 4w/e 22/04/1961
83B Taunton 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/02/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 4866
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (133)    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 1466    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 1466    

prev prev