Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 557 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2672 Week
» 25178 Month
» 328368 Year
» 1549933 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4903 m/e 12/1928

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1928 ASTLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 254
To Service During 12/1928
Withdrawal Fri 09/10/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965
Service Life 35 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1928
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 26/12/1959
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 26/03/1960
84B Oxley 4w/e 30/12/1961
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 06/10/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/11/1962
83B Taunton 4w/e 29/06/1963
81C Southall 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 09/10/1964
85A Worcester 6w/e 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/11/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 85A Worcester 3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 SLS/194701
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4903, name: ASTLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
09/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4903    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    

prev prev