Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 859 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5433 Week
» 33391 Month
» 68033 Year
» 1289598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4907 m/e 01/1929
GWR (Oil Burner) 3903 m/e 05/1947
GWR (Ex-Oil) 4907 m/e 04/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1929 BROUGHTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1929
Withdrawal During 08/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 34 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 20/05/1950
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 31/01/1952
82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1953
87F Llanelly 4w/e 16/05/1953
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/09/1953
85C Hereford 4w/e 03/10/1953
81A Old Oak Common 8w/e 26/03/1955
81F Oxford 4w/e 21/05/1955
81C Southall 4w/e 22/03/1958
85A Worcester 4w/e 28/11/1959
86C Hereford 4w/e 21/04/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 21/04/1962
WDN   5w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4907, name: BROUGHTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4907    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev