Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 499 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 499 Week
» 23005 Month
» 326195 Year
» 1547760 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4919 m/e 03/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1929 DONNINGTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 254
To Service During 03/1929
Withdrawal Fri 09/10/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965
Service Life 35 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1929
84B Oxley 4w/e 31/12/1950
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 14/07/1956
81F Oxford 4w/e 06/10/1962
82C Swindon 4w/e 09/02/1963
82C Swindon 4w/e 02/11/1963
81C Southall 4w/e 25/01/1964
   Withdrawn on 09/10/1964
85A Worcester 6w/e 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 09/02/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 82C Swindon 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester 3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801
19/02/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4919, name: DONNINGTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
09/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4919    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    

prev prev