Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 755 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6360 Week
» 17907 Month
» 417589 Year
» 494176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4930   05/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1929 HAGLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1929
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 34 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/04/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 6w/e 30/06/1952
82D Westbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
83B Taunton 4w/e 17/05/1958
83C Exeter 4w/e 21/05/1960
83B Taunton 4w/e 08/10/1960
83C Exeter 4w/e 05/11/1960
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 14/07/1962
82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 1972
Current Status Static Exhibit
Information Awaiting restoration - currently on display in the Engine House at Highley on the Severn Valley Railway
Link www.svr.co.uk/
Status Date 19/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4930, name: HAGLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4930    

prev prev