Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 465 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 465 Week
» 22971 Month
» 326161 Year
» 1547726 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4931 m/e 05/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1929 HANBURY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 254
To Service During 05/1929
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1929
81C Southall 4w/e 28/02/1951
83G Penzance 4w/e 01/01/1955
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4931, name: HANBURY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4931    

prev prev