Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 880 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4740 Week
» 7322 Month
» 271955 Year
» 1493520 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4933 m/e 06/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1929 HIMLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 254
To Service During 06/1929
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 35 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1929
82D Westbury 4w/e 31/12/1950
82D Westbury 4w/e 28/02/1951
81F Oxford 7w/e 31/08/1952
81E Didcot 4w/e 08/10/1955
85A Worcester 4w/e 05/10/1957
84D Leamington 4w/e 25/01/1958
82D Westbury 4w/e 06/09/1958
82B St Philips Marsh 2w/e 17/11/1962
84E Tyseley w/e 22/06/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 14/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 82D Westbury m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 5w/e 11/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
17/09/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1929 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4933, name: HIMLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
31/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4933    

prev prev