Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 809 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5383 Week
» 33341 Month
» 67983 Year
» 1289548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4934 m/e 06/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1929 HINDLIP HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1929
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/10/1948
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 2w/e 12/07/1952
82C Swindon 4w/e 01/11/1952
84B Oxley 4w/e 21/03/1953
84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/05/1953
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/11/1953
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 22/05/1954
81C Southall 4w/e 22/02/1958
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1960
82C Swindon 4w/e 22/04/1961
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 17/06/1961
83B Taunton 4w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4934, name: HINDLIP HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4934    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev