Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 798 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5399 Week
» 16946 Month
» 416628 Year
» 493215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4936   06/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1929 KINLET HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1929
Withdrawal During 01/1964
Service Life 34 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira 4w/e 06/11/1954
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 27/12/1958
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/05/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4936, name: KINLET HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4936    

prev prev