Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 812 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5386 Week
» 33344 Month
» 67986 Year
» 1289551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4939 m/e 07/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1929 LITTLETON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1929
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 04/1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 31/03/1951
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/06/1954
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/11/1954
81E Didcot 4w/e 29/12/1956
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RDGw Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 81C Southall m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4939, name: LITTLETON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4939    

prev prev