Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 763 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6368 Week
» 17915 Month
» 417597 Year
» 494184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4942   07/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1929 MAINDY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1929
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 34 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83C Exeter 4w/e 16/07/1955
84C Banbury 4w/e 08/10/1955
83C Exeter 4w/e 18/06/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/12/1960
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
81E Didcot 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4942, name: MAINDY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4942    

prev prev