Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 797 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5371 Week
» 33329 Month
» 67971 Year
» 1289536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4956 m/e 09/1929

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1929 PLOWDEN HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1929
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 31/12/1950
82D Westbury m/e 16/06/1956
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 06/10/1956
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/02/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/02/1962
81C Southall 4w/e 14/07/1962
82D Westbury 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 4956, name: PLOWDEN HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4956    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev