Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4976 m/e 01/1930

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1930 WARFIELD HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1930
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 34 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1953
85A Worcester 4w/e 25/02/1956
83D Laira m/e 16/06/1956
83G Penzance 4w/e 01/11/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 11/07/1959
81E Didcot 4w/e 08/10/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 21/04/1962
81F Oxford 4w/e 06/04/1963
81F Oxford 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 21/04/1962
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 4976, name: WARFIELD HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4976    

prev prev