Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 780 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5381 Week
» 16928 Month
» 416610 Year
» 493197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4979   02/1930

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1930 WOOTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1930
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 21/03/1953
81E Didcot 4w/e 08/10/1955
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 05/10/1957
81F Oxford 4w/e 12/06/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 12/07/1958
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 4979, name: WOOTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4979    

prev prev