Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 493 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 493 Week
» 22999 Month
» 326189 Year
» 1547754 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4986 m/e 01/1931

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1931 ASTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 268
To Service During 01/1931
Withdrawal Fri 11/05/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1931
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 21/03/1953
84B Oxley 8w/e 26/03/1955
84A Stafford Road m/e 16/06/1956
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 13/06/1959
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 26/12/1959
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 31/12/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 25/03/1961
   Withdrawn on 11/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 13/06/1959
1STALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 25/03/1961
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4986, name: ASTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4986    

prev prev