Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 400 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 400 Week
» 22906 Month
» 326096 Year
» 1547661 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4995 m/e 02/1931

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1931 EASTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 268
To Service During 02/1931
Withdrawal Fri 08/06/1962
Scrapping During 08/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1931
81F Oxford 4w/e 12/06/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 27/02/1960
   Withdrawn on 08/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   m/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4995, name: EASTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4995    

prev prev