Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 303 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3765 Week
» 23498 Month
» 320512 Year
» 397099 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5 17/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 44005 15/11/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
CROSS FELL 17/10/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 17/10/1959
Withdrawn 30/04/1978
Time in Service 18 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 11/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) 17/10/1959
17A Derby w/e 07/11/1959
1B Camden w/e 23/04/1960
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 30/04/1960
1B Camden w/e 16/07/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn 30/04/1978

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1959 To Service To service as D5, name: CROSS FELL
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
15/11/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 44005    
30/04/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 44005    
11/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev