Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 883 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 883 Week
» 23864 Month
» 387109 Year
» 463696 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5000 05/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 24005 11/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 05/09/1958
Withdrawn 31/01/1976 off Longsight (LO)
Time in Service 17 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 05/09/1958
17A Derby (on loan) 05/09/1958
73C Hither Green (on loan) w/e 27/01/1959
1A Willesden w/e 16/06/1962
73C Hither Green (on loan) w/e 16/06/1962
1A Willesden m/e 07/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 17/08/1963
1A Willesden w/e 14/09/1963
1B Camden w/e 09/01/1965
1A Willesden w/e 27/02/1965
1E Bletchley w/e 02/10/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
   Withdrawn 04/01/1969
55A Holbeck (MR) (Reinstated) 05/10/1969
66A Polmadie w/e 16/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
LO Longsight w/e 11/01/1975
   Stored 2w/e 12/07/1975
   Withdrawn 31/01/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/09/1958 Allocation Loaned to Derby (17A)    
05/09/1958 To Service To service as D5000
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
27/01/1959 Allocation Loaned to Hither Green (73C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Loaned to Hither Green (73C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
03/09/1966 Sightings Last day of through services on the Great Central main line: Worked the 14:38 Marylebone-Nottingham Victoria Last Years of the Great Central Mainline (Robert Robotham) Link
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
04/01/1969 Withdrawn      
05/10/1969 Reinstated Reinstated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 24005    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (LO)    
12/07/1975 Allocation      
12/07/1975 To Store To Store    
31/01/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 24005 from Longsight (LO)    
30/04/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev