Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 303 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3765 Week
» 23498 Month
» 320512 Year
» 397099 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5001 29/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 24001 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 29/10/1958
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 30/11/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 29/10/1958
17A Derby (on loan) 01/11/1958
73C Hither Green (on loan) w/e 04/02/1959
1A Willesden m/e 01/06/1962
73C Hither Green (on loan) w/e 16/06/1962
1A Willesden (returned from loan) w/e 28/07/1962
1C Watford w/e 06/10/1962
1A Willesden w/e 16/02/1963
5A Crewe North w/e 17/08/1963
1A Willesden w/e 14/09/1963
1B Camden w/e 09/01/1965
1A Willesden w/e 27/02/1965
1F Rugby w/e 02/10/1965
2F Bescot w/e 12/03/1966
D02 Birmingham Division 18/04/1966
D01 London Division w/e 01/10/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
   Withdrawn 25/01/1969
55A Holbeck (MR) (Reinstated) 05/10/1969
66A Polmadie w/e 16/10/1971
65A Eastfield m/e 03/1972
LO Longsight w/e 11/01/1975
ED Eastfield w/e 08/02/1975
   Stored (Carlisle Kingmoor) m/e 07/1975
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1958 To Service To service as D5001
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
01/11/1958 Allocation Loaned to Derby (17A)    
04/02/1959 Allocation Loaned to Hither Green (73C)    
01/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Loaned to Hither Green (73C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
12/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
25/01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5001    
05/10/1969 Reinstated Reinstated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24001    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (LO)    
08/02/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
07/1975 To Store To Store at Carlisle Kingmoor (KD)    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24001    
30/11/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev