|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 25/08/1926 | 07/09/1926 | 14 days | Light Repair | Tender number 1582 (Dean 4,000g) attached. Renumbered to GWR 5001 |
||
Swindon Works | 11/11/1926 | 24/12/1926 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/03/1928 | 12/06/1928 | 79 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 03/12/1928 | 19/12/1928 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/01/1930 | 01/04/1930 | 83 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
209140 | |
Swindon Works | 29/05/1931 | 26/08/1931 | 90 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2585 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
305292 | |
Swindon Works | 01/11/1932 | 01/1933 | Intermediate | 396347 | |||
Swindon Works | 11/01/1934 | 04/03/1934 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) |
470832 | |
Swindon Works | 20/02/1935 | 14/04/1935 | 54 days | Intermediate | 542693 | ||
Swindon Works | 22/06/1936 | 20/08/1936 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
619283 | |
Swindon Works | 28/10/1937 | 15/12/1937 | 49 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2691 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
706090 | |
Swindon Works | 01/05/1939 | 28/06/1939 | 59 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
795807 | |
Swindon Works | 20/07/1939 | 17/08/1939 | 29 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/12/1940 | 16/02/1941 | 62 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2724 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
874513 | |
Swindon Works | 23/06/1942 | 23/00/1942 | General | ||||
Newton Abbot | 08/01/1944 | 21/02/1944 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/05/1944 | 21/07/1944 | 57 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1046850 | |
Swindon Works | 30/05/1945 | 27/07/1945 | 59 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/12/1945 | 08/01/1946 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 31/05/1946 | 04/07/1946 | 35 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2556 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1136891 | |
Swindon Works | 28/09/1946 | 22/10/1946 | 25 days | Running Repairs | Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/11/1946 | 10/01/1947 | 44 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2647 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/03/1947 | 1 day | Running Repairs | ||||
Swindon Works | 07/01/1948 | 12/02/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1205938 | |
Swindon Works | 19/08/1949 | 21/09/1949 | 34 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2644 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1281622 | |
Swindon Works | 20/07/1950 | 30/08/1950 | 42 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2896 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/01/1952 | 08/02/1952 | 39 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2739 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1386272 | |
Swindon Works | 20/04/1953 | 26/05/1953 | 37 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/11/1953 | 27/01/1954 | 71 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4060 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1483003 | |
Swindon Works | 17/07/1954 | 25/08/1954 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 25/08/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 42 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1562582 | |
Swindon Works | 22/05/1956 | 26/11/1956 | 189 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 11/09/1957 | 22/01/1958 | 134 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1644513 | |
Swindon Works | 28/01/1958 | 07/02/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) | 13/02/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 11/11/1959 | 06/01/1960 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4126 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1729040 | |
Swindon Works | 27/05/1961 | 28/07/1961 | 63 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 9607 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4098 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1797375 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) | SLS/194702 |
31/03/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. | SLS/194705 |
31/01/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds | SLS/194803 |
31/08/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. | SLS/194910 |
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works (Triangle) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
23/07/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1926 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5001, name: LLANDOVERY CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
25/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1926. Dep: 07/09/1926. Work undertaken: Tender number 1582 (Dean 4,000g) attached. Renumbered to GWR 5001 |
||
11/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1926. Dep: 24/12/1926. | ||
26/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1928. Dep: 12/06/1928. | ||
03/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1928. Dep: 19/12/1928. | ||
09/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/01/1930. Dep: 01/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/05/1931. Dep: 26/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2585 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
20/09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
10/1931 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g number 2586 | ||
01/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/11/1932. Dep: ?/01/1933. | ||
11/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1934. Dep: 04/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) |
||
20/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1935. Dep: 14/04/1935. | ||
14/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
13/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
22/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1936. Dep: 20/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1937. Dep: 15/12/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2691 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
01/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/05/1939. Dep: 28/06/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1939. Dep: 17/08/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
17/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1940. Dep: 16/02/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2724 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1942. Dep: 23/00/1942. | ||
21/08/1942 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6685 boiler fitted | ||
21/08/1942 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2444 | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Newton Abbot (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 21/02/1944. | ||
26/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1944. Dep: 21/07/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1945. Dep: 27/07/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1945. Dep: 08/01/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1946. Dep: 04/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2556 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2669 | ||
28/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 22/10/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1946. Dep: 10/01/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2647 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 12/03/1947. | ||
28/03/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2860 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
07/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1948. Dep: 12/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/06/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2434 | ||
19/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/08/1949. Dep: 21/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2644 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/07/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2790 | ||
20/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1950. Dep: 30/08/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 2896 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 08/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2739 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 26/05/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/11/1953. Dep: 27/01/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 4060 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1954. Dep: 25/08/1954. | ||
25/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/08/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1956. Dep: 26/11/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/02/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2876 | ||
11/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/09/1957. Dep: 22/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
28/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1958. Dep: 07/02/1958. | ||
26/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
13/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. | ||
11/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4126 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
27/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/05/1961. Dep: 28/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9607 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4098 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
14/09/1962 | To Store | To Store at Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
04/02/1963 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
26/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |