Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 163 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 163 Week
» 163 Month
» 189298 Year
» 1410863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5002   28/08/1926

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/08/1926 LUDLOW CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 234
To Service Tue 28/08/1926 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 01/09/1964 off Southall (81C)
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 38 yrs , 4 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2384 09/1926 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 13/06/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2565 20/08/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2538 24/06/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2582 22/01/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2611 21/03/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2582 30/05/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2627 24/11/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2394 03/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2406 04/01/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2730 21/06/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 26/03/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2698 12/09/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2541 23/11/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2448 05/01/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2806 30/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2632 12/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 15/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 15/08/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2415 30/10/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2619 26/01/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2532 10/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4057 26/10/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2398 10/09/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2725 05/01/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2820 11/01/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4100 25/02/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4125 03/01/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2716 31/10/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2806 08/02/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4124 06/11/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 28/08/1926
CDF Cardiff Canton 18/06/1929
LA Laira 29/08/1930
NA Newton Abbot 23/12/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton 28/01/1934
LDR Landore 13/06/1939
SDN Swindon 12/01/1941
LDR Landore m/e 02/1941
CARM Carmarthen m/e 07/1949
87E Landore 10/01/1950
87G Carmarthen m/e 09/1956
87E Landore m/e 10/1956
82C Swindon 03/01/1958
85A Worcester 12/11/1959
82C Swindon 08/02/1960
   Stored (Swindon) 24/09/1962
81D Reading (W.R.) (Reinstated) m/e 03/1963
82B St Philips Marsh 30/11/1963
81D Reading (W.R.) 13/04/1964
81C Southall 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn 01/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CARM Carmarthen 4w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   01/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/08/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4630)
13/06/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4632)
20/08/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
22/01/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4641)
24/11/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
23/11/1942 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
30/01/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
15/08/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6688)
30/10/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4633)
26/10/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4637)
10/09/1953 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4635)
03/01/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6653)
08/02/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7636)
06/11/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7638)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 14/09/1926 09/10/1926 26 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 16/11/1926 21/12/1926 36 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/01/1928 05/05/1928 117 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/04/1929 18/06/1929 67 days Heavy
Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
178234
Swindon Works 24/06/1930 29/08/1930 67 days Heavy
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
270888
Swindon Works 13/05/1931 02/07/1931 51 days Light Repair
Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/11/1932 23/12/1932 47 days Intermediate 396029
Swindon Works 25/11/1933 28/01/1934 65 days General
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
450206
Swindon Works 05/12/1934 24/12/1934 20 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 30/01/1935 31/03/1935 61 days Intermediate
Tender number 2611 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
531436
Swindon Works 22/04/1936 07/06/1936 47 days Intermediate
Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
606324
Swindon Works 07/10/1937 05/12/1937 60 days General
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
696768
Swindon Works 18/04/1939 13/06/1939 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2394 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
786713
Swindon Works 31/10/1940 12/01/1941 74 days Intermediate
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
874647
Swindon Works 27/02/1942 31/03/1942 33 days Light Repair
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 17/10/1942 24/11/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
967669
Swindon Works 19/12/1944 30/01/1945 43 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2806 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1068598
Swindon Works 23/02/1945 12/03/1945 18 days Running Repairs
Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 06/02/1946 15/03/1946 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/06/1946 15/08/1946 55 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1131618
Swindon Works 23/09/1947 30/10/1947 38 days General
Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1194474
Swindon Works 22/12/1948 26/01/1949 36 days Light Casual
Tender number 2619 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 02/12/1949 10/01/1950 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2532 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1296237
Swindon Works 14/09/1951 26/10/1951 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1368901
Swindon Works 28/07/1953 10/09/1953 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1449353
Swindon Works 07/11/1954 05/01/1955 60 days Light Casual
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/11/1955 11/01/1956 48 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2820 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1550461
Swindon Works 18/07/1957 03/01/1958 170 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4125 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1621689
Swindon Works 28/11/1959 08/02/1960 73 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7636 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2806 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1714569
Swindon Works 18/09/1961 06/11/1961 50 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7638 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1786214

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/08/1926 To Service To service as GWR Number 5002, name: LUDLOW CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
09/1926 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2384    
14/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926.    
16/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1926. Dep: 21/12/1926.    
10/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928.    
13/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/04/1929. Dep: 18/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
24/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/06/1930. Dep: 29/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
13/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1931. Dep: 02/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1932. Dep: 23/12/1932.    
23/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 28/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
05/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1934. Dep: 24/12/1934.    
30/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1935. Dep: 31/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2611 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1936. Dep: 07/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1937. Dep: 05/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1939. Dep: 13/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2394 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
31/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/10/1940. Dep: 12/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
21/06/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2730    
27/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1942. Dep: 31/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/09/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2698    
17/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 24/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/01/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2448    
19/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1944. Dep: 30/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2806 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 23/02/1945. Dep: 12/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1946. Dep: 15/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 15/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1947. Dep: 30/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1948. Dep: 26/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2619 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM)    
02/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1949. Dep: 10/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2532 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
14/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/09/1951. Dep: 26/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
28/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/07/1953. Dep: 10/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1954. Dep: 05/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1955. Dep: 11/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2820 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/02/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4100    
09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
18/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/07/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4125 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
03/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
31/10/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2716    
12/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
28/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1959. Dep: 08/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7636 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2806 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
18/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 06/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7638 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
24/09/1962 To Store To Store at Swindon (82C)    
03/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5002 from Southall (81C)    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev