Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 826 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5797 Week
» 20374 Month
» 383619 Year
» 460206 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5003 12/12/1958
TOPS (Tops) 24003 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 12/12/1958
Withdrawn 16/08/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 31/07/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 12/12/1958
73C Hither Green w/e 11/03/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 30/04/1960
1A Willesden w/e 17/03/1962
2A Rugby w/e 16/06/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 03/07/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
65A Eastfield w/e 06/03/1971
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 16/08/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/12/1958 To Service To service as D5003
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
22/08/1959 Sightings D5003/9 worked the 12:13 Ramsgate - Derby Friargate holiday train as far as Kensington Olympia. Black five 45260 completed the journey The Early Years of London Diesels  
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24003    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
16/08/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24003    
31/07/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev