Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 939 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 6283 Week
» 7173 Month
» 315154 Year
» 1199535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5003   28/05/1927

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/05/1927 LULWORTH CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 28/05/1927 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Wed 29/08/1962 off Newton Abbot (83A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2386 05/1927 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 09/03/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2537 08/04/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 30/11/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 22/06/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 04/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2415 11/08/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2687 27/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2413 14/01/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2547 16/08/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2731 18/09/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2444 07/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2843 26/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 19/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2388 12/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 11/10/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 06/08/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2555 02/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2717 27/02/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2566 14/03/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 23/01/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2613 30/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 19/11/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2887 24/01/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2877 11/12/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4004 26/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 28/05/1927
CDF Cardiff Canton 09/06/1934
NA Newton Abbot 13/03/1936
TN Taunton m/e 05/1937
EXE Exeter 17/08/1937
SDN Swindon 20/01/1941
EXE Exeter m/e 03/1941
LA Laira 14/07/1941
EXE Exeter 18/09/1941
SDN Swindon 07/08/1942
TN Taunton 27/08/1942
83C Exeter 27/02/1951
83D Laira 09/02/1957
87G Carmarthen 11/12/1957
86C Cardiff Canton 20/03/1958
83A Newton Abbot 17/03/1959
   Withdrawn 29/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 83C Exeter m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/05/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4631)
08/04/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4640)
30/11/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4613)
22/06/1933 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4658)
11/08/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4601)
07/08/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6659)
11/10/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4620)
06/08/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6610)
02/06/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6665)
27/02/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
14/03/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4626)
30/11/1953 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4617)
24/01/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6621)
26/04/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6653)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 18/12/1928 08/03/1929 81 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 30/01/1930 12/04/1930 73 days Heavy
Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2537 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
198948
Swindon Works 10/09/1930 16/10/1930 37 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/10/1931 05/12/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
307765
Swindon Works 03/05/1933 06/1933   General  
Swindon Works 17/04/1934 09/06/1934 54 days Intermediate 470978
Swindon Works 06/02/1935 19/03/1935 42 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 15/01/1936 13/03/1936 59 days Intermediate
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
572459
Swindon Works 17/06/1937 17/08/1937 62 days General
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
654679
Swindon Works 19/08/1938 12/09/1938 25 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/05/1939 06/07/1939 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
757480
Swindon Works 18/11/1940 20/01/1941 64 days Intermediate
Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
830650
Swindon Works 12/08/1941 18/09/1941 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/06/1942 07/08/1942 56 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2444 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
899879
Swindon Works 12/08/1942 27/08/1942 16 days Light Repair
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/03/1943 24/04/1943 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
928455
Swindon Works 29/08/1945 11/10/1945 44 days General
Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1021279
Swindon Works 20/06/1947 06/08/1947 48 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1088409
Swindon Works 29/04/1949 02/06/1949 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2555 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1157744
Swindon Works 26/01/1951 27/02/1951 33 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2717 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1231515
Swindon Works 06/02/1952 14/03/1952 38 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1276141
Swindon Works 12/12/1952 23/01/1953 43 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/10/1953 30/11/1953 41 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1345052
Swindon Works 05/10/1954 19/11/1954 46 days Light Casual
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/11/1955 24/01/1956 64 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6621 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2887 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1435067
Swindon Works 09/02/1956 07/03/1956 28 days Unclassified  
Newton Abbot 05/02/1957 09/02/1957 5 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 30/10/1957 11/12/1957 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2877 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1526504
Swindon Works 06/02/1960 26/04/1960 81 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4004 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1624593

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2386    
28/05/1927 To Service To service as GWR Number 5003, name: LULWORTH CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
18/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1928. Dep: 08/03/1929.    
09/03/1929 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2411    
30/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/01/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2537 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1930. Dep: 16/10/1930.    
14/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1933. Dep: ?/06/1933.    
22/06/1933 Modification Diagram HA number 4658 boiler fitted    
22/06/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2445    
17/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.    
09/06/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
06/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1935. Dep: 19/03/1935.    
15/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/01/1936. Dep: 13/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (TN)    
17/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1937. Dep: 17/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/08/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
19/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1938. Dep: 12/09/1938.    
10/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1939. Dep: 06/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/11/1940. Dep: 20/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
14/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
12/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 18/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
13/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1942. Dep: 07/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2444 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
12/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 27/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (TN)    
08/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/03/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/12/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2388    
29/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1945. Dep: 11/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/06/1947. Dep: 06/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/04/1949. Dep: 02/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2555 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 27/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2717 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
06/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/10/1953. Dep: 30/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/11/1955. Dep: 24/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6621 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2887 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 07/03/1956.    
05/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Newton Abbot (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.    
09/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
30/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1957. Dep: 11/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2877 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
06/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1960. Dep: 26/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4004 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
29/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5003 from Newton Abbot (83A)    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev