Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 612 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1871 Week
» 24852 Month
» 388097 Year
» 464684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5004 22/12/1958
TOPS (Tops) 24004 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 22/12/1958
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 22/12/1958
73C Hither Green w/e 11/03/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 16/01/1960
91S To Southern Region w/e 16/06/1962
1A Willesden w/e 29/09/1962
1B Camden w/e 09/01/1965
1A Willesden w/e 27/02/1965
1F Rugby w/e 02/10/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
65A Eastfield w/e 06/03/1971
LO Longsight w/e 11/01/1975
ED Eastfield w/e 08/02/1975
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1958 To Service To service as D5004
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24004    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (LO)    
08/02/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24004    
02/04/1977 Sightings On St. Rollox Works    
30/04/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev