Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 312 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3774 Week
» 23507 Month
» 320521 Year
» 397108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5005 03/01/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/01/1959
Withdrawn 25/01/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs , 22 dys
Cut Up 12/1969
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 03/01/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 11/03/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 04/06/1960
91S To Southern Region w/e 20/08/1960
5A Crewe North w/e 02/06/1962
2A Rugby w/e 16/06/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 03/07/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
   Withdrawn 25/01/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/01/1959 To Service To service as D5005
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
02/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
25/01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5005    
12/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev