Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1005 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7125 Week
» 18696 Month
» 266989 Year
» 1151370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5005   11/06/1927

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/06/1927 MANORBIER CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 11/06/1927 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal During 02/1960 off Swindon (82C)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2422 04/06/1927 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2559 04/07/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2539 17/05/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2427 27/12/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 29/03/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2424 30/06/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2687 24/12/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 28/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2551 30/12/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2417 07/08/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2856 23/05/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2578 25/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2530 20/02/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 30/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2402 01/06/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 17/10/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2557 21/12/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 01/04/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2816 04/06/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2934 02/08/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2544 13/02/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2409 24/03/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2532 26/01/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2424 29/11/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4032 09/02/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 11/07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2716 13/10/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2675 27/04/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Notes
Notes In January 1935, in response to developments in locomotive design, Charles Collett reluctantly agreed to the streamlining of two locomotives: 5005 Manorbier Castle and a King (6014) were selected and given a rather ugly token streamlining. The various parts of the casing were removed over the next 14 years.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 11/06/1927
TN Taunton 09/07/1930
LA Laira m/e 09/1930
TN Taunton 23/12/1930
LA Laira m/e 01/1931
PDN Old Oak Common 21/05/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton 21/12/1945
83A Newton Abbot m/e 12/1956
81A Old Oak Common 20/03/1958
82C Swindon 26/09/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   m/e 29/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/06/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4633)
04/07/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4629)
17/05/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4607)
29/03/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4618)
24/12/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4647)
01/06/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4645)
21/12/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4630)
04/06/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4622)
23/08/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
13/02/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6676)
09/02/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6687)
27/05/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6631)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 12/04/1928 16/05/1928 35 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/01/1929 02/04/1929 83 days General  
Swindon Works 08/05/1930 09/07/1930 63 days Heavy
Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2559 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
202763
Swindon Works 08/04/1932 21/05/1932 44 days General
Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
306364
Swindon Works 25/07/1932 28/08/1932 35 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/10/1933 07/01/1934 75 days Intermediate
Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
399700
Swindon Works 16/01/1935 15/04/1935 90 days General
Streamlining applied
Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
477045
Swindon Works 18/05/1935 05/06/1935 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/07/1935 27/07/1935 8 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/09/1935 06/09/1935 5 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/11/1935 30/11/1935 11 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 06/05/1936 06/1936   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 07/11/1936 11/11/1936 5 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/04/1937 07/05/1937 24 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/11/1937 02/01/1938 55 days General
Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
653558
Swindon Works 08/05/1939 08/07/1939 62 days Intermediate
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
758143
Swindon Works 25/11/1939 04/01/1940 41 days Light Repair
Tender number 2551 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/04/1941 31/05/1941 61 days Intermediate
Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
844516
Swindon Works 14/06/1941 26/07/1941 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2578 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/04/1943 12/06/1943 71 days General
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2402 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
939518
Swindon Works 09/09/1944 17/10/1944 39 days Light Repair
Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/11/1945 21/12/1945 31 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4630 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2557 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1050314
Swindon Works 02/05/1947 04/06/1947 34 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2816 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1125371
Swindon Works 18/07/1949 23/08/1949 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1222833
Swindon Works 10/01/1951 13/02/1951 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1297819
Swindon Works 05/01/1953 09/02/1953 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4032 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1391653
Swindon Works 28/12/1953 26/01/1954 30 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 14/08/1954 13/10/1954 61 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2716 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1469378
Swindon Works 27/02/1956 27/05/1956 91 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6631 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2675 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1537572
Swindon Works 28/01/1958 06/03/1958 38 days Heavy Intermediate 1638491

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2422    
11/06/1927 To Service To service as GWR Number 5005, name: MANORBIER CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
12/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1928. Dep: 16/05/1928.    
10/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 02/04/1929.    
08/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1930. Dep: 09/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2559 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (TN)    
09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
23/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (TN)    
01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
08/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/05/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
25/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/07/1932. Dep: 28/08/1932.    
25/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1933. Dep: 07/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1935. Dep: 15/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Streamlining applied
Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 05/06/1935.    
20/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.    
02/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1935. Dep: 06/09/1935.    
20/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.    
06/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1936. Dep: ?/06/1936.    
30/06/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2424    
07/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1936. Dep: 11/11/1936.    
14/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1937. Dep: 07/05/1937.    
09/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1937. Dep: 02/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 04/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2551 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/08/1940 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2417    
01/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2578 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/02/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2530    
30/01/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2656    
03/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2402 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1944. Dep: 17/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/11/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4630 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2557 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
01/04/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2535    
02/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1947. Dep: 04/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2816 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 23/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 13/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2409    
26/01/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2532    
29/11/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2424    
05/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 09/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4032 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2868    
28/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1953. Dep: 26/01/1954.    
14/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1954. Dep: 13/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2716 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 27/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6631 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2675 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
28/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1958. Dep: 06/03/1958.    
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
26/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5005 from Swindon (82C)    

prev prev