Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5006 03/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24006 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/01/1959
Withdrawn 16/08/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1980
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 03/01/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 11/03/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 05/03/1960
5B Crewe South w/e 17/03/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 12/05/1962
1F Rugby w/e 14/09/1963
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 17/07/1965
1F Rugby w/e 02/10/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
65A Eastfield w/e 06/03/1971
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 16/08/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/01/1959 To Service To service as D5006
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
05/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24006    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
16/08/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24006    
31/12/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev