Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 128 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7869 Week
» 28311 Month
» 365157 Year
» 1586722 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5006 on 11/06/1927

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/06/1927 TREGENNA CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 234
To Service Tue 11/06/1927 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 03/04/1962 off Carmarthen (87G)
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2351 11/06/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2429 20/06/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2598 05/04/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 23/06/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 02/06/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2622 28/01/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 19/04/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2637 01/04/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2794 16/09/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2449 02/05/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2593 28/10/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2565 11/04/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 11/10/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2579 27/05/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2386 19/05/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 29/09/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 23/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 15/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2826 19/09/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2653 27/04/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4011 31/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 02/08/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2565 14/02/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 17/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4032 11/07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4006 04/10/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 08/09/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2649 21/05/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 29/11/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2403 09/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4071 01/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2621 04/10/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2784 11/07/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 11/06/1927
LA Laira m/e 06/1933
LDR Landore on 29/06/1934
PDN Old Oak Common on 17/12/1935
BRD Bristol Bath Road on 24/04/1938
WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 05/1938
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 06/1938
LDR Landore m/e 12/1942
CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 07/1948
81A Old Oak Common m/e 06/1954
87G Carmarthen on 20/03/1958
87E Landore on 13/07/1960
87F Llanelly on 06/07/1961
87G Carmarthen on 11/09/1961
   Withdrawn on 03/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/06/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4634)
20/06/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4621)
10/01/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4601)
05/04/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4619)
02/06/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4616)
28/01/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4625)
27/05/1942 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4659)
15/05/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6656)
27/04/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6655)
31/01/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6658)
02/08/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4644)
17/04/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6650)
09/11/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6619)
01/08/1958 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4610)
13/07/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6656)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 18/04/1928 05/05/1928 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 17/04/1929 28/06/1929 73 days Heavy
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2429 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
140916
Swindon Works 12/11/1930 17/01/1931 67 days General
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
249018
Swindon Works 01/02/1932 16/04/1932 76 days General
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2598 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
329073
Swindon Works 18/04/1933 06/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 24/04/1934 29/06/1934 67 days General
Boiler number 4616 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
462009
Swindon Works 22/10/1935 17/12/1935 57 days Intermediate 563075
Swindon Works 12/12/1936 07/02/1937 58 days General
Boiler number 4625 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
643134
Swindon Works 21/02/1938 24/04/1938 63 days Intermediate
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
720994
Swindon Works 30/08/1938 14/09/1938 16 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 24/10/1938 05/11/1938 13 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 27/02/1939 06/04/1939 39 days Light Repair
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/07/1939 24/09/1939 69 days Intermediate
Tender number 2794 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
802912
Swindon Works 30/03/1940 06/05/1940 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/09/1940 06/11/1940 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/02/1941 12/04/1941 64 days Light Repair
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/04/1942 30/05/1942 54 days General
Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
921233
Swindon Works 11/04/1943 23/05/1943 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/08/1944 29/09/1944 45 days Intermediate
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1038356
Swindon Works 04/04/1946 15/05/1946 42 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6656 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1112315
Swindon Works 13/08/1947 19/09/1947 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2826 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/03/1948 27/04/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1180618
Swindon Works 19/08/1948 24/09/1948 37 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/01/1950 31/01/1950 30 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4011 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1249679
Swindon Works 02/05/1950 15/05/1950 14 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 13/11/1950 05/12/1950 23 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 11/06/1951 02/08/1951 53 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1320128
Swindon Works 15/01/1952 14/02/1952 31 days Light Casual
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/02/1953 17/04/1953 65 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1408697
Swindon Works 02/07/1954 02/09/1954 63 days Heavy Intermediate 1475349
Swindon Works 01/10/1955 29/11/1955 60 days Light Casual
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/03/1956 09/11/1956 242 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6619 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1558914
Swindon Works 23/04/1958 01/08/1958 101 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1645212
Swindon Works 09/05/1960 13/07/1960 66 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6656 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1725219

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). SLS/194710
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2351    
11/06/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5006, name: TREGENNA CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
18/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928.    
17/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/04/1929. Dep: 28/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2429 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
   
01/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2598 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1933. Dep: 00/06/1933.    
06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
23/06/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2543    
24/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1934. Dep: 29/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4616 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/06/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
22/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1935. Dep: 17/12/1935.    
17/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
12/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 07/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4625 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/02/1938. Dep: 24/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/04/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY)    
06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
30/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1938. Dep: 14/09/1938.    
24/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 24/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.    
27/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1939. Dep: 06/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/07/1939. Dep: 24/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2794 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 06/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1940. Dep: 06/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/10/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2426    
07/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1942. Dep: 30/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
11/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1943. Dep: 23/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1944. Dep: 29/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/03/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2423    
04/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/04/1946. Dep: 15/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6656 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1947. Dep: 19/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2826 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1948. Dep: 27/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
19/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1948. Dep: 24/09/1948.    
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 31/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4011 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 15/05/1950.    
13/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 05/12/1950.    
11/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 02/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1952. Dep: 14/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 17/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4032    
04/10/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4006    
06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/07/1954. Dep: 02/09/1954.    
08/09/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2674    
21/05/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2649    
01/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1955. Dep: 29/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 09/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6619 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
23/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1958. Dep: 01/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
04/10/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2621    
09/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/05/1960. Dep: 13/07/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6656 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
11/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
03/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5006 from Carmarthen (87G)    

prev prev