Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 862 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 862 Week
» 23843 Month
» 387088 Year
» 463675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5007 07/02/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24007 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 07/02/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 31/01/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 07/02/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 21/03/1959
73C Hither Green 3w/e 01/05/1959
91S To Southern Region w/e 16/06/1962
1A Willesden w/e 24/11/1962
1B Camden w/e 09/01/1965
1E Bletchley w/e 03/01/1966
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 08/04/1967
65A Eastfield w/e 06/03/1971
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/02/1959 To Service To service as D5007
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
20/06/1959 Sightings D5007/10 worked the 3:42 SO relief from Victoria - Folkestone Harbour The Early Years of London Diesels  
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24007    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24007    
31/01/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev