Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5008 28/02/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24008 07/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 28/02/1959
Withdrawn 16/08/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 31/05/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 28/02/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 21/03/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 25/04/1959
73C Hither Green 3w/e 01/05/1959
18A Toton w/e 09/05/1959
91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 18/07/1959
17A Derby w/e 26/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 24/10/1959
91S To Southern Region w/e 09/01/1960
73C Hither Green 6w/e 05/10/1960
1B Camden w/e 21/07/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 13/10/1962
1B Camden w/e 22/12/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 05/01/1963
1A Willesden w/e 11/09/1965
1F Rugby w/e 08/01/1966
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 22/04/1967
65A Eastfield w/e 06/03/1971
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 16/08/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/02/1959 To Service To service as D5008
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
25/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
01/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
24/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
07/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24008    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
16/08/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24008    
31/05/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev