Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 158 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4670 Week
» 27176 Month
» 330366 Year
» 1551931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5008 on 30/06/1927

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/06/1927 RAGLAN CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 234
To Service Fri 30/06/1927 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2026 30/06/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2412 22/07/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 22/10/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 23/06/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 29/04/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 30/04/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2431 02/12/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2414 18/03/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2813 02/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2442 14/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2626 11/05/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 03/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2861 30/12/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2780 16/07/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2774 09/03/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2771 28/01/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2559 09/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2912 17/05/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 16/01/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2798 23/03/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2438 28/06/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2574 12/06/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4079 18/06/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4115 27/03/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) on 30/06/1927
PDN Old Oak Common on 20/12/1930
CARM Carmarthen on 23/12/1930
CDF Cardiff Canton on 09/03/1932
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 06/1933
WOS Worcester on 06/12/1938
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 01/1939
SDN Swindon on 21/10/1949
81F Oxford on 04/02/1950
84A Stafford Road m/e 07/1950
81A Old Oak Common m/e 11/1956
87G Carmarthen on 30/12/1956
81A Old Oak Common on 30/01/1957
   Withdrawn on 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/06/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4636)
22/07/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4651)
02/03/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4657)
04/12/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4624)
14/08/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6686)
03/05/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6623)
30/12/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4605)
11/07/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
09/03/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6629)
28/01/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6663)
17/05/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6681)
28/06/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6652)
12/06/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6670)
27/03/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 9601)
27/03/1961 Double Chimney fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 19/04/1928 09/05/1928 21 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 21/05/1929 30/07/1929 71 days Heavy
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
130381
Swindon Works 22/10/1930 20/12/1930 60 days Light Intermediate 214580
Swindon Works 22/01/1932 09/03/1932 48 days General
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
280249
Swindon Works 02/05/1933 06/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 24/04/1934 20/06/1934 58 days Intermediate 427722
Swindon Works 22/10/1935 16/12/1935 56 days General
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
516519
Swindon Works 23/06/1936 06/07/1936 14 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/03/1937 30/09/1937 206 days Intermediate
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
606328
Swindon Works 17/10/1938 06/12/1938 51 days General
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/02/1940 30/03/1940 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2414 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
773211
Swindon Works 16/06/1941 05/07/1941 20 days Running Repairs
Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/06/1942 17/08/1942 66 days General
Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2442 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
878044
Swindon Works 16/02/1944 29/03/1944 43 days Intermediate 957217
Swindon Works 11/04/1944 13/05/1944 33 days Light Repair
Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/03/1946 03/05/1946 39 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1041756
Swindon Works 19/11/1947 30/12/1947 42 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1121355
Swindon Works 31/05/1949 11/07/1949 42 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
1199584
Swindon Works 07/02/1951 09/03/1951 31 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1280376
Swindon Works 19/12/1952 28/01/1953 41 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6663 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1369319
Swindon Works 12/04/1955 17/05/1955 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2912 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1467973
Swindon Works 02/03/1957 28/06/1957 119 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1550753
Swindon Works 10/04/1959 12/06/1959 64 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1647703
Swindon Works 27/01/1961 27/03/1961 60 days Heavy General
Boiler number 9601 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4115 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1727816

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. SLS/194606
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801
30/06/1949 Swindon Works (entering Works) New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908
19/02/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2026    
30/06/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5008, name: RAGLAN CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
19/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1928. Dep: 09/05/1928.    
21/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/05/1929. Dep: 30/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1930. Dep: 20/12/1930.    
20/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
23/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM)    
22/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1932. Dep: 09/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
   
09/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
22/10/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2411    
02/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1933. Dep: 00/06/1933.    
06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
23/06/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2583    
24/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1934. Dep: 20/06/1934.    
22/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1935. Dep: 16/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
   
23/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1936. Dep: 06/07/1936.    
09/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1937. Dep: 30/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1938. Dep: 06/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/12/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
07/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2414 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 16/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1942. Dep: 17/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2442 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/02/1944. Dep: 29/03/1944.    
11/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1946. Dep: 03/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1947. Dep: 30/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 11/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
   
16/07/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2780    
21/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
07/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/12/1952. Dep: 28/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6663 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2559    
12/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 17/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2912 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/01/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4007    
11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
30/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
30/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/03/1957. Dep: 28/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 12/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/06/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4079    
27/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/01/1961. Dep: 27/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9601 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4115 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5008 from Old Oak Common (81A)    

prev prev