Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 310 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3772 Week
» 23505 Month
» 320519 Year
» 397106 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5009 14/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24009 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 14/03/1959
Withdrawn 18/07/1976
Time in Service 17 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 30/11/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 14/03/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 28/03/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 12/05/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 12/05/1962
1A Willesden w/e 23/11/1963
5A Crewe North w/e 05/12/1964
1B Camden w/e 09/01/1965
1E Bletchley w/e 03/01/1966
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 22/04/1967
65A Eastfield w/e 06/03/1971
   Stored 4w/e 23/08/1975
HA Haymarket 5w/e 27/09/1975
   Stored 4w/e 29/05/1976
   Withdrawn 18/07/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/03/1959 To Service To service as D5009
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
22/08/1959 Sightings D5003/9 worked the 12:13 Ramsgate - Derby Friargate holiday train as far as Kensington Olympia. Black five 45260 completed the journey - All over green The Early Years of London Diesels  
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
05/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24009    
23/08/1975 Allocation      
23/08/1975 To Store To Store    
27/09/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HA)    
29/05/1976 To Store To Store    
18/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 24009    
30/11/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev