Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 869 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 869 Week
» 23850 Month
» 387095 Year
» 463682 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5010 21/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24010 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 21/03/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 28/02/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 21/03/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 11/04/1959
21D Aston w/e 02/06/1962
2A Rugby w/e 16/06/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 03/07/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/07/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 03/06/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1969
D05 Stoke Division (Reinstated) w/e 02/08/1969
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1959 To Service To service as D5010
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
20/06/1959 Sightings D5007/10 worked the 3:42 SO relief from Victoria - Folkestone Harbour The Early Years of London Diesels  
02/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
09/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
03/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5010    
02/08/1969 Reinstated Reinstated to Stoke Division (D05)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24010    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24010    
28/02/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev