|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 11/04/1928 | 04/07/1928 | 85 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 25/01/1929 | 27/03/1929 | 62 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
105441 | |
Swindon Works | 26/05/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 62 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2561 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
194382 | |
Swindon Works | 23/04/1931 | 15/06/1931 | 54 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
262352 | |
Swindon Works | 18/07/1932 | 13/09/1932 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA) |
324537 | |
Swindon Works | 25/01/1934 | 24/04/1934 | 90 days | Intermediate | 419511 | ||
Swindon Works | 20/02/1935 | 19/04/1935 | 59 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
489011 | |
Swindon Works | 21/05/1936 | 14/07/1936 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
566693 | |
Swindon Works | 21/09/1937 | 12/11/1937 | 53 days | Intermediate | 644886 | ||
Swindon Works | 11/07/1939 | 12/09/1939 | 64 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
741871 | |
Swindon Works | 03/06/1941 | 31/08/1941 | 90 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
827400 | |
Swindon Works | 05/08/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 39 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 03/11/1942 | 20/01/1943 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
893741 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 39 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 27/04/1944 | 22/05/1944 | 26 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2761 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 24/02/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 43 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
996301 | |
Swindon Works | 04/06/1946 | 24/07/1946 | 51 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2701 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1066105 | |
Swindon Works | 14/01/1947 | 18/01/1947 | 5 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4008 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1154166 | |
Swindon Works | 29/03/1950 | 08/05/1950 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6664 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1237214 | |
Swindon Works | 13/12/1951 | 25/01/1952 | 44 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1301104 | |
Swindon Works | 13/03/1953 | 14/05/1953 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4068 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1368274 | |
Swindon Works | 22/11/1954 | 05/01/1955 | 45 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1454807 | |
Swindon Works | 14/03/1956 | 17/05/1956 | 65 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 26/11/1956 | 21/02/1957 | 88 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1551078 | |
Swindon Works | 06/05/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4061 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1619214 | |
Swindon Works | 18/09/1959 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | Sightings | No. 5813 seen at RDG various dates early Jan.: Thought this was CARM! 5010 fresh out SDN on 8/1 appeared to be marked SLO, but probably GLO. | SLS/194302 |
31/05/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. | SLS/194807 |
30/06/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1927 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 0 | ||
26/07/1927 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5010, name: RESTORMEL CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1928. Dep: 04/07/1928. | ||
25/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/01/1929. Dep: 27/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/05/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2561 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
23/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1931. Dep: 15/06/1931. Work undertaken: Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
12/04/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2565 | ||
18/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1932. Dep: 13/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA) |
||
19/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
25/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1934. Dep: 24/04/1934. | ||
24/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
20/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1935. Dep: 19/04/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
31/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
21/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1936. Dep: 14/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/09/1937. Dep: 12/11/1937. | ||
08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
11/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/07/1939. Dep: 12/09/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
03/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1941. Dep: 31/08/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1942. Dep: 20/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
08/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1944. Dep: 22/05/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2761 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1946. Dep: 24/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2701 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/01/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2436 | ||
14/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1947. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
04/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4008 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
29/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/03/1950. Dep: 08/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6664 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
23/05/1950 | To Store | To Store at Stafford Road (84A) | ||
26/07/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
12/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
13/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/12/1951. Dep: 25/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
13/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1953. Dep: 14/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4068 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
19/06/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4006 | ||
22/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/11/1954. Dep: 05/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1956. Dep: 17/05/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/11/1956. Dep: 21/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4061 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/09/1959. | ||
05/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5010 from Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |