Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5011 |
28/03/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24011 |
01/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
28/03/1959 to Crewe South (5B) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
30/04/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
28/03/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/10/1962 |
R.11194 |
Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
£18/18/2 |
|
£18/18/2 |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
11/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
22/04/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Severe |
|
Not known |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5011 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
13/10/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
09/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24011 |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24011 |
|
|
30/04/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|