Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 576 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1710 Week
» 21443 Month
» 318457 Year
» 395044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5011 28/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24011 01/12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 28/03/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 28/03/1959
17A Derby w/e 28/03/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 11/04/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 05/05/1962
1A Willesden w/e 05/05/1962
2A Rugby w/e 16/06/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 03/07/1965
D01   w/e 16/04/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/07/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 03/06/1967
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
28/03/1959 To Service To service as D5011
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
16/04/1966 Allocation      
09/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
03/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 24011    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24011    
30/04/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev prev