Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 313 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3775 Week
» 23508 Month
» 320522 Year
» 397109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5014 09/05/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24014 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 09/05/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 09/05/1959
17A Derby w/e 09/05/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 16/05/1959
91S To Southern Region w/e 16/06/1962
2A Rugby w/e 30/06/1962
9A Longsight w/e 26/12/1964
1F Rugby w/e 01/05/1965
9A Longsight w/e 20/11/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D01 London Division w/e 23/04/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/07/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 03/06/1967
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
09/05/1959 To Service To service as D5014
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
26/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
01/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
20/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
09/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
03/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24014    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24014    
31/03/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev