Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 556 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19467 Week
» 84421 Month
» 287085 Year
» 3313938 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5014 |
09/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24014 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
09/05/1959 to Crewe South (5B) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
on 23/03/1978* *Official list from Doncaster Works |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
09/05/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/08/1962 |
E.4983/1 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
£324/-/- |
|
£324/-/- |
02/12/1962 |
E.4341 |
Removal of Down Sanding Gear |
|
£-56/-/10 |
£105/8/- |
£49/7/- |
19/01/1963 |
R.11194 |
Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
£18/18/2 |
|
£18/18/2 |
18/04/1964 |
A/RC/4 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
|
£294/14/2 |
|
£294/14/2 |
18/04/1964 |
R.10768 |
Modify 'catch and stay' on water duct |
|
£17/8/3 |
|
£17/8/3 |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
BR AWS |
|
|
11/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Derby (17A) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5014 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
30/08/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
02/12/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Removal of Down Sanding Gear |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Modification |
Modification: Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Modification |
Modification: Modify 'catch and stay' on water duct |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24014 |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24014 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|