Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 310 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3772 Week
» 23505 Month
» 320519 Year
» 397106 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5015 30/05/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24015 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/05/1959
Withdrawn 16/08/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 30/05/1959
17A Derby (on loan) w/e 30/05/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 13/06/1959
1B Camden w/e 29/08/1959
1A Willesden w/e 19/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 17/10/1959
2F Bescot w/e 03/01/1966
D02 Birmingham Division 18/04/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 03/06/1967
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 16/08/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1959 Allocation Loaned to Derby (17A)    
30/05/1959 To Service To service as D5015
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
09/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/6) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
09/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/6) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
10/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
10/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
11/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
11/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
12/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
12/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
13/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
13/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
03/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24015    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
16/08/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24015    
01/01/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
16/01/1977 Sightings Derelict shell at Doncaster Works John Woolley  

prev prev