Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 138 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6527 Week
» 26969 Month
» 363815 Year
» 1585380 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5016 on 09/07/1932

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/07/1932 MONTGOMERY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 280
To Service Mon 09/07/1932 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 17/09/1962 off Llanelly (87F)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 30 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2608 07/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4107 09/07/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2610 10/09/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2608 06/11/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2589 12/04/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 14/01/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2568 20/04/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2582 22/07/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2402 18/11/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2415 26/02/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2659 26/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2708 19/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2571 06/05/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 17/02/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 23/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4003 29/10/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4001 22/11/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2443 27/07/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2860 04/09/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2744 23/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2693 04/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4001 11/10/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2624 05/05/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 29/11/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2659 24/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2398 24/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2659 26/02/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4079 16/02/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 09/07/1932
NA Newton Abbot m/e 12/1933
PZ Penzance m/e 04/1936
LA Laira on 19/01/1937
PZ Penzance m/e 01/1938
LDR Landore on 03/05/1938
83D Laira on 11/10/1954
87E Landore m/e 12/1954
87F Llanelly on 13/06/1961
   Withdrawn on 17/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1961
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/07/1932 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6603)
12/04/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4619)
18/11/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6614)
19/01/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4639)
29/10/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6602)
27/07/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6653)
23/06/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6659)
10/06/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6664)
24/05/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6666)
16/02/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7659)
16/02/1961 Double Chimney fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 19/10/1933 12/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 03/10/1934 23/11/1934 52 days Light Repair
Tender number 2608 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 19/02/1935 15/04/1935 56 days General
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
161588
Swindon Works 30/09/1935 26/10/1935 27 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/12/1935 17/01/1936 36 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 03/12/1936 19/01/1937 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
249769
Swindon Works 24/02/1938 03/05/1938 69 days General
Tender number 2568 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
331750
Swindon Works 19/07/1939 29/07/1939 11 days Light Repair
Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/10/1939 12/1939   Intermediate
Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2402 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
425819
Swindon Works 06/02/1940 03/03/1940 27 days Light Repair
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/04/1941 04/08/1941 101 days Intermediate
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
514136
Swindon Works 10/12/1942 24/01/1943 46 days General
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2708 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
604511
Swindon Works 21/03/1944 10/05/1944 51 days Light Repair
Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 09/01/1945 17/02/1945 40 days Intermediate
Tender number 2423 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
702952
Swindon Works 26/09/1946 29/10/1946 34 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
786576
Swindon Works 14/06/1948 27/07/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
868978
Swindon Works 19/04/1949 20/05/1949 32 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 19/05/1950 23/06/1950 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
957036
Swindon Works 05/05/1952 10/06/1952 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6664 (Diagram HB)
1039040
Swindon Works 11/09/1953 04/11/1953 55 days Light Casual
Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/08/1954 11/10/1954 46 days Light Casual
Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1132421
Swindon Works 04/03/1955 05/05/1955 63 days Light Casual
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/10/1955 29/11/1955 60 days Light Casual
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 09/01/1957 24/05/1957 136 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1225997
Swindon Works 08/01/1959 26/02/1959 50 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1308549
Swindon Works 22/12/1960 16/02/1961 57 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7659 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4079 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1398360

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. SLS/194808
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/01/1901 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4107    
07/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2608    
09/07/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5016, name: MONTGOMERY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
10/09/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2610    
19/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/10/1933. Dep: 00/12/1933.    
12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
03/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1934. Dep: 23/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2608 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1935. Dep: 15/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935.    
13/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1935. Dep: 17/01/1936.    
04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
03/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1936. Dep: 19/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
24/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1938. Dep: 03/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2568 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
19/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1939. Dep: 00/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2402 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1940. Dep: 03/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 04/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1942. Dep: 24/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2708 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1944. Dep: 10/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2423 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/03/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2396    
26/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1946. Dep: 29/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4001    
14/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1948. Dep: 27/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/09/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2860    
19/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949.    
19/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/05/1950. Dep: 23/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 10/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6664 (Diagram HB)
   
11/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1953. Dep: 04/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1954. Dep: 11/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
04/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1955. Dep: 05/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1955. Dep: 29/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2659    
09/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/01/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1959. Dep: 26/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/12/1960. Dep: 16/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7659 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4079 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
13/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
17/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5016 from Llanelly (87F)    

prev prev