Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 893 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 893 Week
» 23874 Month
» 387119 Year
» 463706 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5017 06/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24017 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 06/06/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 06/06/1959
17A Derby w/e 06/06/1959
73C Hither Green w/e 04/07/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 05/05/1962
1A Willesden w/e 05/05/1962
2A Rugby w/e 16/06/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 19/01/1963
1A Willesden w/e 11/09/1965
1F Rugby w/e 08/01/1966
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/07/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 03/06/1967
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
06/06/1959 To Service To service as D5017
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
10/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
10/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
11/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
11/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
12/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
12/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
13/06/1959 Sightings 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
13/06/1959 Sightings 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) Trains Illustrated 8/59  
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
09/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
03/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24017    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24017    
01/03/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev